Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aureliano de Matos

Deceased

Bishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1889Born
30 Nov 191425.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 194050.6AppointedBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
29 Sep 194051.2Ordained BishopBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
19 Aug 196778.1DiedBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aureliano de Matos
Bishop Aureliano de Matos (born , died ) Bishop of Limoeiro do Norte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItapagé

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018