Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimundo de Castro e Silva

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oeiras

Titular Bishop of Uzalis

Auxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1905BornAracoiaba
4 Dec 193227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
17 Jun 195045.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Teresina, Brazil
17 Jun 195045.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Eluza
15 Aug 195045.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eluza
17 Nov 195449.5AppointedBishop of Oeiras, Brazil
9 Nov 195752.5ResignedBishop of Oeiras, Brazil
9 Nov 195752.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
9 Nov 195752.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzalis
2 Aug 199186.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Oeiras, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Raimundo de Castro e Silva:
Bishop Raimundo de Castro e Silva (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oeiras

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013