Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Orlandi, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefal¨


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1610BornCarini
20 Oct 162818.6ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
25 Jun 167464.3AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
1 Jul 167464.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
13 Nov 169585.7DiedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy

MicroData Summary for Matteo Orlandi:
Bishop Matteo Orlandi O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Cefal¨

  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 155
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1674, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015