Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Nicola Gilberti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornSan Ginesio
20 Oct 165828.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 168151.3AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
18 May 168151.3Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
29 Nov 169767.9ResignedBishop of Teano, Italy
6 Oct 169969.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Teano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Nicola Gilberti:
Bishop Giuseppe Nicola Gilberti (born 1630, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Teano

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 373
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015