Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Emmanuelle Durazzo

Deceased

Bishop of Accia and Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1639¹BornGenova
25 Jun 167435.4AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
1 Jul 167435.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
19 May 170465.3AppointedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
Jun 1707³68.4DiedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mario Emmanuelle Durazzo:
Bishop Mario Emmanuelle Durazzo , Bishop of Accia and Mariana

  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 76, and Page 256
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015