Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Desio

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1628Born
8 Apr 165122.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 167446.0AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
16 May 167446.0Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
Aug 1677³49.2DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Desio
Bishop Giovanni Battista Desio (born , died Aug 1677) Bishop of Venosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 410
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast