Catholic-Hierarchy DC

St. Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Tomasi di Lampedusa, C.R. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1649BornLicata, Greece
25 Mar 166616.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
23 Dec 167324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
18 May 171262.7Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jul 171262.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
1 Jan 171363.3DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
29 Sep 1803Beatified
12 Oct 1986Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Giuseppe Maria Tomasi di Lampedusa:
Cardinal St. Giuseppe Maria Tomasi di Lampedusa C.R. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a cardinal for .6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013