Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcantonio Zollio

Deceased

Bishop of Crema, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹Born
18 Jul 167845.5AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
21 Aug 167845.6Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
20 Apr 170269.3DiedBishop of Crema, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Zollio
Bishop Marcantonio Zollio (born 1633, died ) Bishop of Crema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast