Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Pannocchieschi d’Elci

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625Born
27 Aug 166338.6AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
11 Nov 166338.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
20 Jun 170277.4DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pannocchieschi d’Elci:
Archbishop Francesco Pannocchieschi d’Elci (died ) Archbishop of Pisa

  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 280
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 3 Apr 2015