Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Dacoury-Tabley

Bishop Emeritus of Grand-Bassam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1934 BornKpapékou
27 Dec 196127.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 197944.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
9 Apr 197944.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana
22 Jul 197944.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana
19 Dec 199460.0AppointedBishop of Grand-Bassam, Côte d’Ivoire
27 Mar 201075.3RetiredBishop of Grand-Bassam, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Paul Dacoury-Tabley:
Bishop Paul Dacoury-Tabley (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Grand-Bassam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grand-Bassam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013