Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marko Culej

Deceased

Bishop of Varaždin, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1938Born
24 Apr 196426.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 199253.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
7 Jan 199253.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Limata
22 Feb 199254.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limata
5 Jul 199759.4AppointedBishop of Varaždin, Croatia
19 Aug 200668.5DiedBishop of Varaždin, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Marko Culej
Bishop Marko Culej (born , died ) Bishop of Varaždin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRepno

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,915
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast