Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juraj Jezerinac

Bishop Emeritus of Croatia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1939 Born
26 Jun 196627.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 199151.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
11 Apr 199151.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Strumnitza
8 Jun 199152.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Strumnitza
25 Apr 199758.0AppointedBishop of Croatia, Military
30 Nov 201576.6RetiredBishop of Croatia, Military

MicroData Summary for Juraj Jezerinac
Bishop Juraj Jezerinac (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Croatia, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJezerine

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Croatia, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,407
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,452
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast