Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Djuro Kokša

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Titular Bishop of Grumentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1922Born
26 Oct 194725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
20 Apr 197855.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
20 Apr 197855.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Grumentum
23 Jul 197856.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Grumentum
26 Nov 199876.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Djuro Kokša
Bishop Djuro Kokša (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMolve

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast