Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gennangi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria

Titular Bishop of Adana degli Armeni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1898Born
3 Apr 192122.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 195456.0AppointedBishop of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria
12 Dec 195456.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria
20 Nov 197274.1RetiredBishop of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria
20 Nov 197274.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Adana degli Armeni
22 Oct 198183.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gennangi
Bishop Joseph Gennangi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kamichlié

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMardin

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast