Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Cortés Soriano

Bishop of Sant Feliu de Llobregat, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1947 Born
23 Dec 197124.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 199850.3AppointedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
18 Apr 199850.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ibiza, Spain
15 Jun 200456.6AppointedBishop of Sant Feliu de Llobregat, Spain
12 Sep 200456.8InstalledBishop of Sant Feliu de Llobregat, Spain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Cortés Soriano
Bishop Agustín Cortés Soriano (born ) Bishop of Sant Feliu de Llobregat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sant Feliu de Llobregat.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast