Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Caius Asterius Toppi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Milevum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1669³Born
20 Sep 169222.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 172859.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
Feb 1729³59.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
20 May 175484.5DiedTitular Bishop of Milevum

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Caius Asterius Toppi
Bishop Caius Asterius Toppi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Milevum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChieti

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast