Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gustavo Matteoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1877Born
1900¹22.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 192042.3AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
25 Mar 192042.4Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
29 Apr 192446.5AppointedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
3 Mar 193254.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Siena, Italy
3 Mar 193254.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia
29 Sep 193254.9SucceededArchbishop of Siena, Italy
17 Nov 193457.0DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Matteoni
Archbishop Gustavo Matteoni (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Maria della Querce
Ordained BishopCathedral, San Miniato

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 11
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast