Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo del Tomba

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montalcino

Titular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1866BornFigline Valdarno
29 Apr 190942.5AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
20 Jun 190942.6Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
31 Oct 190943.0InstalledBishop of Montalcino, Italy
10 Jul 193770.7ResignedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
10 Jul 193770.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
10 Aug 194477.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Montalcino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfredo del Tomba:
Bishop Alfredo del Tomba (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montalcino

  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013