Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentín Comellas y Santamaría

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1861Born
28 Feb 188523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Solsona, Spain
18 Dec 191958.5AppointedAdministrator of Solsona, Spain
18 Dec 191958.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hamatha
16 May 192058.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hamatha
5 Sep 193372.2AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
19 Mar 194583.7DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Valentín Comellas y Santamaría
Bishop Valentín Comellas y Santamaría (born , died ) Bishop of Solsona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaserras

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 50
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast