Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Comparone

Deceased

Bishop of Alife-Caiazzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1924BornAversa
2 Feb 194722.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 199065.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy
26 May 199065.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy
10 Dec 199066.4SucceededBishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy
5 Jan 199873.5DiedBishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Comparone:
Bishop Nicola Comparone (born , died ) Bishop of Alife-Caiazzo

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,880
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013