Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bonaventura D’Avalos, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nocera de’ Pagani

Titular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹BornVasto
23 Feb 164335.1AppointedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
1 Mar 164335.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
13 Apr 165446.3AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
7 Feb 165951.1ResignedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
20 Apr 167163.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia
15 Mar 167567.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura D’Avalos:
Archbishop Bonaventura D’Avalos O.S.A. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nocera de’ Pagani

  • a bishop for 32.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 233
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 374, and Page 263
  • r/d: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • r/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014