Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Binago, C.O. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

Titular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578²Born
18 Jun 159517.4ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
12 Jan 163759.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
12 Jan 163759.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
24 Feb 163759.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
17 Oct 164365.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Binago
Bishop Girolamo Binago C.O. (born 1578, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Death PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria di Galliera, Church, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,410
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 214
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 39
  • c2+/loc: AT, 16 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 17 Oct 2018

Quantcast