Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John William Bewick

Deceased

Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1824Born
27 May 185026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
12 Sep 188258.3AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
18 Oct 188258.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
29 Oct 188662.5DiedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John William Bewick
Bishop John William Bewick (born , died ) Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinisteracres, Consett, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Newcastle upon Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Death PlaceBishop's House, Tynemouth, North Shields, Northumberland, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Buried Place (Original)Ashburton, Cemetery, Gosforth, Newcastle upon Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 297
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 33
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 61
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast