Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Ferreira Viçoso, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1787BornPeniche, Portugal
7 Mar 181830.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
15 Jul 184356.2SelectedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
22 Jan 184456.7ConfirmedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
5 May 184457.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mariana, Brazil
7 Jul 187588.2DiedBishop of Mariana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Ferreira Viçoso:
Bishop Antônio Ferreira Viçoso C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Mariana

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013