Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João da Matha de Andrade e Amaral

Deceased

Bishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1898Born
20 Mar 192123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
24 Mar 193436.1AppointedBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
20 May 193436.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
12 May 194143.2AppointedBishop of Amazonas, Brazil
20 Mar 194850.1AppointedBishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil
7 Nov 195456.7DiedBishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil

MicroData Summary for João da Matha de Andrade e Amaral
Bishop João da Matha de Andrade e Amaral (born , died ) Bishop of Niterói (Nictheroy)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltinho

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast