Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Diotallevi, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1613¹BornRimini
3 Oct 166754.7AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
9 Oct 166754.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
28 Sep 167663.7DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Diotallevi:
Bishop Alessandro Diotallevi C.R.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Pesaro

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 315
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015