Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lelio Cardinal Falconieri

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585²BornFlorence, Italy
4 Dec 163449.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
10 Dec 163449.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
1642²57.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
13 Jul 164358.5Elevated to Cardinal
31 Aug 164358.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
14 Dec 164863.9DiedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lelio Falconieri:
Lelio Cardinal Falconieri (died ) Secretary of Bishops and Regulars

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
  • a cardinal for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 332
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 94, Number 567
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 20 Mar 2015