Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Aaron Chisha

Bishop Emeritus of Mansa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1933 BornKapatu
29 Aug 196531.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 199359.6AppointedBishop of Mansa, Zambia
12 Dec 199360.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mansa, Zambia
15 Jan 200975.1RetiredBishop of Mansa, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Andrew Aaron Chisha:
Bishop Andrew Aaron Chisha (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mansa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mansa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013