Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunato Chirichigno Pontolido, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Piura, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1880Born
18 Dec 191030.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Dec 194060.5AppointedBishop of Piura, Peru
2 Mar 194160.7Ordained BishopBishop of Piura, Peru
2 Jan 195372.6DiedBishop of Piura, Peru

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Chirichigno Pontolido
Bishop Fortunato Chirichigno Pontolido S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Piura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast