Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Boschi

Deceased

Bishop of Carpi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1746Born
23 Mar 176922.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 178841.7AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
Oct 1788²41.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
18 Sep 180760.7AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
21 Mar 181568.2DiedBishop of Carpi, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Boschi
Bishop Giacomo Boschi (born , died ) Bishop of Carpi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTivoli, Diocese of Tivoli

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1808
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 130
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 135
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,704
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast