Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diego Innico Cardinal Caracciolo di Martina

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1759Born
11 Aug 180041.0Elevated to Cardinal
20 Oct 180041.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
26 Sep 181455.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
6 Nov 181455.3Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
24 Jan 182060.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Diego Innico Caracciolo di Martina
Diego Innico Cardinal Caracciolo di Martina (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMartina Franca, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
  • a cardinal for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1814, Number 8
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Aug 1800

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast