Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Lamberto Cardinal Rusconi

Deceased

Bishop of Imola, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1743Born
1 Jan 180359.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Jan 180359.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 181672.7AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
8 Mar 181672.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Mar 181672.7Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy
29 Apr 181672.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
1 Aug 182582.1DiedBishop of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Lamberto Rusconi
Antonio Lamberto Cardinal Rusconi (born , died ) Bishop of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCento

  • a priest for 22.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
  • a cardinal for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast