Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Antoine-Gabriel d’Osmond de Médavy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1722¹BornMédavy
30 Oct 176341.8SelectedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
20 Feb 176442.1ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
1 Apr 176442.2Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
9 Apr 178563.2ResignedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
28 Apr 180684.3DiedBishop Emeritus of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Antoine-Gabriel d’Osmond de Médavy:
Bishop Charles-Antoine-Gabriel d’Osmond de Médavy (born 1722, died ) Bishop Emeritus of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges

  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 181

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016