Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabien-Sébastien Imberties

Deceased

Bishop of Autun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1737BornCahors
16 Jul 180669.3SelectedBishop of Autun, France
26 Aug 180669.4ConfirmedBishop of Autun, France
8 Dec 180669.7Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
25 Jan 181981.9DiedBishop of Autun, France

MicroData Summary for Fabien-Sébastien Imberties:
Bishop Fabien-Sébastien Imberties (born , died ) Bishop of Autun

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 60
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1806, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015