Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Di Giovanni

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Pessinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1832Born
20 Sep 185623.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 189664.0AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
9 Apr 189764.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis
25 Apr 189764.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis
4 Mar 190168.3ResignedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
22 Mar 190168.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pessinus
20 Jul 190370.7DiedPrelate Emeritus of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Di Giovanni (VIAF: 29898395)
Archbishop Vincenzo Di Giovanni (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Santa Lucia del Mela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalaparuta, Diocese of Mazara del Vallo
Ordained BishopS. Sauveur, Church, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Death PlaceSalaparuta

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 448, and Page 547
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 24
  • d: CB, 11 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017