Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonino Morana

Deceased

Bishop of Caltagirone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1824Born
17 Mar 184823.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187247.6AppointedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
17 Mar 187247.7Ordained BishopBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
18 Aug 187955.1DiedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonino Morana
Bishop Antonino Morana (born , died ) Bishop of Caltagirone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModica, Mission "Sui Iuris" of Siria e Cilicia, Syria
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 171
  • c34: CB, 7 Mar 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,872, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast