Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Benedetto Balsamo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1759BornMessina
27 Mar 178424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Jul 181656.5SelectedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
23 Sep 181656.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
29 Sep 181656.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
6 Apr 184484.3DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Benedetto Balsamo:
Archbishop Domenico Benedetto Balsamo O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Monreale

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 272
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,589

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013