Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomislav Jablanović

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina

Titular Bishop of Aquae in Dacia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1921Born
30 Nov 194322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
16 Nov 197049.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
16 Nov 197049.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Dacia
18 Apr 197149.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Dacia
10 Sep 198665.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Tomislav Jablanović (VIAF: 305548876)
Bishop Tomislav Jablanović (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDolac
Ordained BishopSacred Heart of Jesus, Cathedral, Sarajevo, Archdiocese of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}
Death PlaceMosbach

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 720
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,986, Page 692

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast