Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Margarit de Biure, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608Born
4 May 166860.3SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
12 Nov 166860.8ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
30 Jun 166961.4Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
21 Dec 167264.9DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Vicente Margarit de Biure
Bishop Vicente Margarit de Biure O.P. (born 1608, died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGerona, Spain

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 193
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 182
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 204, Number 1,277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast