Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel de Almeida, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Funchal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621Born
1 Apr 167049.3AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
Jun 167150.4Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
13 Jul 167453.5DiedBishop of Funchal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de Almeida:
Bishop Gabriel de Almeida O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Funchal

  • a bishop for 3.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 191

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013