Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Tani, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ Ducale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1631BornAlbano
7 Apr 165422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Apr 168654.9AppointedBishop of CittÓ Ducale, Italy
15 Apr 168654.9Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ Ducale, Italy
1 Jan 171280.6DiedBishop of CittÓ Ducale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Tani:
Bishop Filippo Tani O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of CittÓ Ducale

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1686, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015