Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardin Marchese

Deceased

Bishop of Sarsina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1633³Born
21 Mar 168349.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Apr 168349.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 168349.8AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
30 May 168349.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
Feb 1699³65.5DiedBishop of Sarsina, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardin Marchese
Bishop Bernardin Marchese (born , died Feb 1699) Bishop of Sarsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnolo

  • a priest for 15.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 346
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast