Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Lenti

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Satriano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633BornAsculan
29 Apr 168047.3AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano, Italy
1 May 168047.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Satriano, Italy
Sep 168451.7DiedBishop of Ascoli Satriano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Lenti:
Bishop Filippo Lenti Bishop of Ascoli Satriano

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013