Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rainutius Baschi

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1616¹BornOrvieto
8 Jun 168266.4AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
14 Jun 168266.4Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
25 Sep 168468.7DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rainutius Baschi:
Bishop Rainutius Baschi (born 1616, died ) Bishop of Senigallia

  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015