Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Cases Andreu

Bishop Emeritus of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1944 Born
14 Apr 196823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain
22 Feb 199449.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain
22 Feb 199449.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Timici
10 Apr 199449.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Timici
26 Jun 199651.6AppointedBishop of Albacete, Spain
26 Nov 200561.0AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
27 Jan 200661.2InstalledBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
6 Jul 202075.7RetiredBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Cases Andreu
Bishop Francisco Cases Andreu (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrihuela, Diocese of Orihuela
Ordained BishopSanto Tomás, Church, Orihuela, Diocese of Orihuela-Alicante

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2005
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,313
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 6 Jul 2020

Quantcast