Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidel Olivas Escudero

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1849BornPomabamba
19 Apr 190051.2AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
15 Aug 190051.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
12 Apr 193586.2DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

MicroData Summary for Fidel Olivas Escudero:
Bishop Fidel Olivas Escudero (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 310
  • c34: CB, 6 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015