Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin-François-Annibal de Farcy de Cuillé

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1706Born
17 May 173932.9SelectedBishop of Quimper, France
30 Sep 173933.2ConfirmedBishop of Quimper, France
8 Nov 173933.4Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper, France
28 Jun 177165.0DiedBishop of Quimper, France

MicroData Summary for Augustin-François-Annibal de Farcy de Cuillé
Bishop Augustin-François-Annibal de Farcy de Cuillé (born , died ) Bishop of Quimper

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuillé

  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018