Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Antoine de Vaccon

Deceased

Bishop of Apt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1689BornAix en Provence
30 Aug 172333.6AppointedBishop of Apt, France
1 Oct 172434.7Ordained BishopBishop of Apt, France
7 Dec 175161.9DiedBishop of Apt, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Antoine de Vaccon:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Antoine de Vaccon (born , died ) Bishop of Apt

  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015