Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Gaughren, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Orange River, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Priene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1849Born
1866¹16.9ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
16 Mar 187223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Jun 188637.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Orange River, South Africa
8 Jun 188637.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Priene
10 Aug 188637.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Priene
15 Jan 190151.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Orange River, South Africa

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Gaughren
Bishop Anthony Gaughren O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Orange River

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChapelizod, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland
Ordained BishopTower Hill-Church of the Martyrs, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 470
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017