Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Burke

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nova Scotia

Titular Bishop of Sion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1753¹BornMaryborough, Ireland
178128.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 181764.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nova Scotia, Canada
4 Jul 181764.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sion
5 Jul 181865.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sion
29 Nov 182067.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Nova Scotia, Canada

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edmund Burke:
Bishop Edmund Burke (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nova Scotia

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013